+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (59)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted
- House/ substituted
- House/ uncircled
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (14)
March 8, 2013: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 56
- Absent: 19
March 7, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
March 7, 2013: Senate/ floor amendment
March 6, 2013: Senate/ uncircled
March 6, 2013: Senate/ circled
March 6, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 9
March 6, 2013: Senate/ substituted
March 4, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2013: House/ uncircled
February 28, 2013: House/ substituted
February 26, 2013: House/ circled
February 19, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
February 14, 2013: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor