+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 18, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor