+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 17, 2005 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2005: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2005: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 11, 2005: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
February 8, 2005: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 2, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor