+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (51)
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ circled
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ lifted from standing committee
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2008: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 6
March 3, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 5
February 13, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor