+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 11
February 23, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor