+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 25, 2003 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On November 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On November 20, 2003 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On November 19, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from General Counsel
- House Received Fiscal Note from Fiscal
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
- House Under Suspension of the Rules
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Read 3rd Time
- House Passed 3rd Reading
- House Sent to Senate
On November 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/received from House
- Senate/under suspension of the rules
- Senate/placed on 2nd
- Senate/read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/signed by President to House
On November 19, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from Senate
- House Signed by Speaker/Enrolled
- Received from House for Enrolling
On November 14, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On November 13, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
November 19, 2003: House Passed 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
November 19, 2003: Senate/pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor