+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- House/ uncircled
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ motion to reconsider
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ failed
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 9, 2015: House/ uncircled
February 19, 2015: House/ circled
February 19, 2015: House/ motion to reconsider
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 8
February 18, 2015: House/ failed
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 42
- Absent: 3
February 6, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor