+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from table
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 23, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment # 3
Passed
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
Senate Amendment # 2
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2010: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 4
March 4, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
February 11, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
February 5, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 7
January 29, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor