+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 19, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
On December 10, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
January 29, 2013: House/ circled
+ − Sponsor
Rep. Webb, R. C.
Type:
Primary Sponsor