+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ lifted from table
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ tabled
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On January 24, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 16, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 19, 2008 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 18, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 25, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 18, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 9, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
January 30, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
January 27, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor