+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (56)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ substituted
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House/ floor amendment failed
- House/ uncircled
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ floor amendment failed
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 9, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
March 5, 2014: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 6
March 4, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
March 3, 2014: Senate/ uncircled
March 3, 2014: Senate/ substituted
February 28, 2014: Senate/ circled
February 11, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 4, 2014: House/ uncircled
February 4, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 1
February 4, 2014: House/ floor amendment failed
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 46
- Absent: 1
February 4, 2014: House/ floor amendment
January 29, 2014: House/ circled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor