+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ substitute
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment # 3
Passed
Senate Amendment # 4
Passed
Senate Amendment # 1
Prepared
Senate Amendment # 2
Prepared
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2009: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 5
March 10, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor