+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ circled
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
January 26, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor