+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
February 4, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor