+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- House/ read 2nd time
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On January 9, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 7, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2004: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 20, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 19, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 12, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 3, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor