+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Received from House for Enrolling
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 16, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On January 13, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 6, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 18
- Absent: 11
February 20, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 5
January 29, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
January 23, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor