+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 6, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 21, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 2
Committee Amendments Prepared
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 23, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
February 11, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
January 25, 2011: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor