+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 63
- Absent: 12
February 6, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor