+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 29, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
February 28, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
February 19, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor