+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 18, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor