+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 17, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 8
February 8, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor