+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 21, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
February 9, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
January 31, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
January 25, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor