+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 14, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 13, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2005: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 23, 2005: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 14, 2005: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2005: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
January 20, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor