+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- House/ filed
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On January 9, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 17, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 15, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2004: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
February 3, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 23, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor