+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (9)
March 3, 2021: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2021: Senate/ circled
March 3, 2021: Senate/ uncircled
March 1, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
February 11, 2021: House/ uncircled
February 11, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 5
February 11, 2021: House/ circled
February 3, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
February 3, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor