+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ lifted from standing committee
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 9, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 7
February 17, 2017: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 3, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
February 3, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
February 3, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor