+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Comm with amends
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor