+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Vote
February 21, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor