+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 7, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor