+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ uncircled
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ substituted
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment # 4
Passed
House Amendment # 2
Passed
Senate Amendment # 3
Passed
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2010: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
March 10, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 17, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor