+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor