+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 11, 2005 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ circled
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 10, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
February 7, 2005: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 3, 2005: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 2, 2005: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
January 28, 2005: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
January 25, 2005: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
January 18, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor