+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ held
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 23, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 11, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
February 4, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor