+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 7, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor