+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2018: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
March 1, 2018: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 16, 2018: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 13, 2018: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 13, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 3
January 31, 2018: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
January 31, 2018: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor