+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (8)
March 5, 2021: Senate/ circled
February 24, 2021: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 4, 2021: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 4, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
January 28, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
January 28, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
January 28, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor