+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 21, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
February 22, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 15, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor