+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ filed
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ to House
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ held
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2017: Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 6
February 23, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 23, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor