+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (13)
March 1, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 29, 2016: Senate/ substituted
February 29, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
February 29, 2016: Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3
February 29, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
February 29, 2016: Senate/ circled
February 11, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 11, 2016: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 5, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
February 1, 2016: House/ uncircled
February 1, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2016: House/ circled
January 26, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor