+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 17
February 27, 2017: House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor