+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
February 28, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 2
- Absent: 5
February 22, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 4
February 22, 2017: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 9, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
February 9, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4