+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 25, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 11, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor