+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2009: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
March 5, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
March 4, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 25, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
February 19, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 13, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor