+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ to Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (9)
March 14, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
March 14, 2013: Senate/ uncircled
March 14, 2013: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 4
March 14, 2013: Senate/ substituted
March 13, 2013: Senate/ circled
March 12, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 6
March 5, 2013: House/ circled
March 4, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor