+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
- House/ to Governor
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ amended/ placed on Consent
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ substituted/ Consent
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2004: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 9
February 23, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
February 11, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor