+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ uncircled
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (10)
March 6, 2017: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 3
March 3, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 9
February 28, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2017: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2017: Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2017: House/ uncircled
February 23, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2017: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 13, 2017: House/ circled
January 31, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor