+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ filed
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted/ amend
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2016: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2016: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor