+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ held
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
February 9, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 2, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 13
February 2, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 13
February 2, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor