+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ filed
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- House/ read 2nd time
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On January 27, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 19, 2007: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor