+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ to Senate
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substitute/ amended/ Consent Cal
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2013: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
March 13, 2013: Senate/ floor amendment
March 13, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 13
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor